IL HB4057 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Roadside Memorial Act. Provides that on and after July 1, 2020, a DUI memorial marker shall bear the message "Don't Drive Under the Influence" (rather than "Please Don't Drink and Drive". Effective immediately.
Title
DUI MEMORIAL MARKERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 125 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4057&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4057.htm |