IL HB4043 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that local authorities may by ordinance or resolution prohibit the operation of vehicles or impose restrictions as to the weight of vehicles to be operated upon highways under their jurisdiction, for a total period not to exceed 90 days, measured in either consecutive or nonconsecutive days at the discretion of local authorities, in any one calendar year, when conditions will seriously damage or destroy the highway.
Title
VEH CD-LOCAL HWY RESTRICT AUTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4043&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4043.htm |