IL HB4043 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Provides that group and individual policies of accident and health insurance and managed care plans must provide coverage for (1) operations to implant cochlear implants and post-treatment services for children identified within one year of birth as being deaf or hearing impaired and (2) audiological services and hearing aids for children up to 18 years of age. Makes other changes.
Title
INS CD-COCHLEAR & HEARING IMPL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-04-22 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 023-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Insurance Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4043&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4043.htm |