IL HB4033 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no person shall operate a motor vehicle with any reflective material, nonreflective material, or tinted film upon the windshield, windows immediately adjacent to each side of the driver, or windows to the rear of the driver's seat unless the person is determined to suffer from light sensitivity as a result of a traumatic brain injury.
Title
VEH CD-TINTED WINDOWS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |