IL HB4032 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides $3.5 million to Court of Claims for Line of Duty Awards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$COURT OF CLAIMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-05-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-05-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback