IL HB4030 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the High Risk Home Loan Act. Provides that "high risk home loan" does not include a loan for reverse mortgage financing of residential real estate, including under programs regulated by the Federal Housing Administration (FHA).
Title
HI RISK HOME LOAN-REVERSE MORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Tabled |
2020-02-18 | House | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 137 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4030&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4030.htm |