IL HB4027 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Transportation Network Providers Act. Provides that if the Governor has, by proclamation, declared that a disaster exists, a transportation network company shall not employ surge pricing in the areas subject to the disaster for the duration of the proclamation. Defines "surge pricing".
Title
TRANS NETWORKS-SURGE PRICING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 57 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 57 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4027&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4027.htm |