IL HB4027 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0527
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0527
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Property Control Act concerning surplus real property. Requires utilization reports to be submitted by July 31 (instead of October 30), declarations of surplus real property to be made by October 31, (instead of December 31), and notification of State agencies by October 31 (instead of December 31).
Title
SURPLUS STATE REAL PROPERTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0527 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-002 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-04-14 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |