IL HB4025 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
Pending: House Civil Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Eviction Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that, in counties that have a website that the staff of the county maintains, if the plaintiff is unable to obtain personal service on the defendant, the sheriff shall cause the notice of the eviction action to be posted on the website of the county where the cause is to be tried at least 10 days before the day set for the appearance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EVICTION-CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2020-01-31HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2020-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2020-01-28HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2020-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2020-01-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2020-01-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading
2020-01-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2020-01-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason
2020-01-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2020-01-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling
2020-01-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2020-01-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2020-01-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2020-01-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2020-01-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2020-01-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2020-01-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73559-107Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback