IL HB4024 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2,500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for a grant to the Chicago Park District for costs associated with lifeguard wages. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$DCEO-LIFEGUARD WAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4024&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB4024.pdf |