IL HB4024 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Office of the State Appellate Defender. Makes further appropriations for: expenses related to federally assisted programs to work on systemic sentencing issues appeals cases; expenses related to providing public defenders in rural counties the resources needed to adequately investigate and defend indigent clients; the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Expungement Program; statewide training to Public Defenders; and developing a Juvenile Defender Resource Center. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
$STATE APPELLATE DEFENDER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4024&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/PDF/10000HB4024.pdf |