IL HB4014 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Legislative Commission Reorganization Act of 1984. Provides that the Architect of the Capitol, in conjunction with the Board of the Office of the Architect of the Capitol and the Secretary of State, shall designate parking spaces in the parking areas serving the buildings and facilities of the legislative complex to be reserved for and used by pregnant women, parents expecting the birth of a child, and parents of newborn children. Effective immediately.
Title
CAPITOL COMPLEX PARKING
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4014&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4014.htm |