IL HB4013 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a public school that has a limited open forum may not deny equal access or a fair opportunity to, or discriminate against, any students who wish to conduct or participate in a meeting or an extracurricular student group within its limited open forum on the basis of the religious, political, philosophical, or other content of the speech at the meeting. Defines terms. Describes what is deemed a fair opportunity. Provides that an extracurricular student group may be student-initiated or teacher-initiated. Provides that a teacher who initiates an extracurricular student group may not receive additional compensation for the teacher's sponsorship of the extracurricular student group, but the extracurricular student group may accept grants or donations from nonprofit organizations to support its operations and activities. Effective July 31, 2020.
Title
SCHOOL CODE-LIMITED OPEN FORUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4013&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4013.htm |