IL HB4013 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Removes a provision prohibiting the non-contributory portion of a health-benefits program from including the expenses of obtaining an abortion, induced miscarriage or induced premature birth unless, in the opinion of a physician, such procedures are necessary for the preservation of the life of the woman seeking such treatment, or except an induced premature birth intended to produce a live viable child and such procedure is necessary for the health of the mother or the unborn child. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Removes a provision excluding abortions, or induced miscarriages or premature births, from the list of services provided under the State's medical assistance program and removes language providing that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services or the Department of Human Services shall, by rule, prohibit any physician from providing medical assistance to anyone eligible under the Code where such physician has been found guilty of performing an abortion procedure in a wilful and wanton manner upon a woman who was not pregnant at the time such abortion procedure was performed. Removes a provision requiring that a written statement including the required opinion of a physician shall accompany any claim for reimbursement for abortions, or induced miscarriages or premature births. Removes other provisions concerning abortion procedures. Amends the Problem Pregnancy Health Services and Care Act. Removes language prohibiting the Department of Human Services from making grants to nonprofit agencies and organizations that use such grants to refer or counsel for, or perform, abortions.
Title
STATE INS-PUB AID-ABORTIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2016-11-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-04-17 | House | Fiscal Note Filed (Corrected) |
2015-04-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-04-10 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-03-27 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2015-03-27 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2015-03-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-03-26 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2015-03-26 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-03-25 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-03-25 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-03-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-03-24 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-03-19 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 008-006-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 6-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 230 | 4-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |