IL HB4011 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Secretary of State Act. Provides that it shall be the duty of the Secretary of State, subject to appropriation, to make grants or otherwise provide assistance to, on an emergency basis, specified not-for-profit organizations for eligible security improvements that assist the organization in preventing, preparing for, or responding to acts of terrorism. Requires the Secretary to establish procedures and forms by which applicants may apply for a grant, and procedures for distributing grants to recipients. Provides that the amount and distribution of grant funds provided to applicants shall be wholly within the discretion of the Secretary. Provides that upon request of the Secretary, a State agency shall provide the Secretary with assistance in administering the grants. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOS-EMERGENCY SECURITY GRANTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-28HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 094-006-000
2017-06-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 094-006-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-002-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Silverstein
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-001-000
2017-05-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-041-001
2017-04-17HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-15HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
153055Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4011&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4011.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4011eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4011enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4011sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4011sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4011_04252017_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4011_05262017_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4011_06282017_012001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4011_06282017_012000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback