IL HB4008 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $56,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Office of the Secretary of State for 28 non-competitively awarded grants, each in the amount of $2,000,000, to community-based organizations based entirely within 28 specified Representative Districts that address violence prevention using a culturally competent approach and that are capable of decreasing violence in those Representative Districts. Provides that the grants shall support violence prevention, youth services, after school programming, counseling services, summer jobs, vocational programs, public awareness campaigns, and other priority areas. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$SOS-VIOLENCE PREVENTION GRANT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 012-009-000
2017-06-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-06-27HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-27HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-30HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2017-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback