IL HB4000 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Prohibits a life insurance company from denying coverage to an individual, limiting the amount, extent, or kind of coverage available to the individual, or charging an individual or group to which the individual belongs a different rate solely because the individual has been prescribed or has obtained through a standing order an opioid antagonist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIFE INS-OPIOID ANTAGONIST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2020-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
2020-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading
2019-12-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155155.47New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback