IL HB3995 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that in a prosecution of a case involving the injury, health, or safety of a cat or dog, the court may, on its own motion or motion of any party, appoint a special advocate to assist the court, as deemed appropriate by the court, and represent the interests of justice regarding the health or safety of the cat or dog. Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall compile a list comprised of pro bono attorneys and law students from each county who may serve as special advocates for these cases.
Title
ANIMAL PROSECUTION-ADVOCATE
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-12-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-12-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-12-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 205 | 205-203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 113A-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | Art. 113A headin | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3995&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3995.htm |