IL HB3988 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Board of Education for YouthBuild Illinois. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$ST BD ED-YOUTHBUILD ILLINOIS
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Laura Faver Dias [D] | Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3988&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB3988.pdf |