IL HB3988 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Missing and Murdered Chicago Women Act. Creates the Task Force on Missing and Murdered Chicago Women. Provides for the composition of the Task Force and its appointment and meetings. Provides that the Task Force must examine and report on the following: (1) the systemic causes behind violence that Chicago women and girls experience, including patterns and underlying factors that explain why disproportionately high levels of violence occur against Chicago women and girls, including underlying historical, social, economic, institutional, and cultural factors that may contribute to the violence; (2) appropriate methods for tracking and collecting data on violence against Chicago women and girls, including data on missing and murdered Chicago women and girls; (3) policies and institutions such as policing, child welfare, medical examiner practices, and other governmental practices that impact violence against Chicago women and girls and the investigation and prosecution of crimes of gender-related violence against Chicago residents; (4) measures necessary to address and reduce violence against Chicago women and girls; and (5) measures to help victims, victims' families, and victims' communities prevent and heal from violence that occurs against Chicago women and girls. Provides that the Task Force shall report annually to the General Assembly and the Governor on the work of the Task Force.
Title
MISSING&MURDERED CHICAGO WOMEN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1057 |
2022-06-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-06-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Safety; 005-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Safety |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-02-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |