IL HB3982 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes a provision in the School Code that allows a school district to transport not more than 15 students to and from an interscholastic athletic or other interscholastic or school-sponsored activity in a van. Provides instead that a school district transporting students in grade 12 or below for an interscholastic, interscholastic athletic, or school-sponsored, noncurriculum-related activity that (i) does not require student participation as part of the educational services of the district and (ii) is not associated with the students' regular class-for-credit schedule or required 5 clock hours of instruction shall transport the students only in a school bus, a vehicle manufactured to transport not more than 10 persons, including the driver, or a multifunction school-activity bus manufactured to transport not more than 15 persons, including the driver; allows for a depreciation allowance claim. In the Illinois Vehicle Code, makes changes with regard to the definition of "school bus" and the requirement that every student enrolled in grade 12 or below in a public or private nursery, primary, or secondary school be transported in specified types of vehicles for certain activities. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective July 1, 2010.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH/VEH CD-TRANSPORT STUDENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-13 Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0410
2009-08-13 Effective Date July 1, 2010
2009-08-13 Governor Approved
2009-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2009-05-19 Passed Both Houses
2009-05-19 Third Reading - Passed; 051-003-000
2009-05-14 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009
2009-05-14 Second Reading
2009-04-29 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
2009-04-29 Do Pass Education; 007-002-000
2009-04-22 Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James T. Meeks
2009-04-22 Assigned to Education
2009-03-30 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-30 First Reading
2009-03-27 Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2009-03-27 Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2009-03-26 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2009
2009-03-26 Arrive in Senate
2009-03-25 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-019-000
2009-03-25 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy
2009-03-17 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-17 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
2009-03-17 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-16 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2009-03-11 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-03-11 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John D'Amico
2009-03-11 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-11 Do Pass / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000
2009-03-03 Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee
2009-02-26 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-26 First Reading
2009-02-26 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D'Amico

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback