IL HB3980 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning advance payments to nursing facilities with significant outstanding Medicaid liability associated with services provided to residents with Medicaid applications pending and residents facing the greatest delays, provides that each facility with an advance payment shall enter into a contract with the Department of Healthcare and Family Services that specifies the terms and conditions of repayment of the advance (rather than that each facility with an advance payment shall state in writing whether its own recoupment schedule will be in 3 or 6 equal monthly installments, as long as all advances are recouped by June 30, 2015). Provides that repayment shall be in the form of no more than 6 equal payments and shall not commence until the processing time for long-term care eligibility determinations equals 90 or fewer days. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-ADVANCE PAYMENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 11-5.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3980&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3980.htm |