IL HB3977 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Repeals evidentiary provisions providing a hearsay exception for intentional murder of a witness and admissibility of prior statements of an unavailable witness whose absence was wrongfully procured. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO- HEARSAY EXCEP REPEAL
Sponsors
Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0243 |
2015-08-03 | House | Effective Date August 3, 2015 |
2015-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 115-10.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 115-10.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |