IL HB3975 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-16)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Prohibits a school district employee or volunteer or an independent contractor of a school district from placing a student in seclusion; defines seclusion. Provides that this prohibition does not apply to the use of seclusion in a court-ordered placement, other than a placement in an educational program of a school district, or in a placement or facility to which other laws or rules apply. Requires State Board of Education rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SECLUSION PROHIBITED

Sponsors

Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D]Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]Rep. David McSweeney [R]Rep. Ann Williams [D]
Rep. Fred Crespo [D]Rep. Daniel Didech [D]Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D]Rep. Theresa Mah [D]
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D]Rep. Mary Edly-Allen [D]Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]Rep. Daniel Swanson [R]
Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. LaShawn Ford [D]Rep. Mark Batinick [R]Rep. Bob Morgan [D]
Rep. Maurice West [D]Rep. Lamont Robinson [D]Rep. Marcus Evans [D]Rep. David Welter [R]
Rep. Joyce Mason [D]Rep. Robyn Gabel [D]Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]Rep. Karina Villa [D]
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D]Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D]Rep. Monica Bristow [D]Rep. Rita Mayfield [D]
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D]Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]Rep. Mark Walker [D]Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D]
Rep. Andrew Chesney [R]Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R]Rep. Mary Flowers [D]Rep. Gregory Harris [D]
Rep. Tony McCombie [R]Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D]Rep. Jeff Keicher [R]Rep. Justin Slaughter [D]
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D]Rep. Delia Ramirez [D]Rep. Frances Hurley [D]Sen. Celina Villanueva [D]
Rep. John D'Amico [D]Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D]Rep. Steven Reick [R]Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D]
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D]Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R]Rep. Michael Unes [R]
Rep. Tom Demmer [R]Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R]Rep. Ryan Spain [R]Rep. John Connor [D]
Rep. Jehan Gordon [D]Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D]Rep. William Davis [D]Rep. Nicholas Smith [D]
Rep. Bradley Stephens [R]Rep. Kelly Burke [D]Rep. Anna Moeller [D]Rep. Margo McDermed [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading
2019-12-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-12-11HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-12-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-11-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-11-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-11-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-11-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-11-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-11-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-11-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.33Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.130Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback