IL HB3975 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that none of the amount received by an individual as primary social security old age and disability retirement benefits shall constitute disqualifying income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNEMPLOY INS-SOCIAL SECURITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2012-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
2012-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2012-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
2012-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2012-03-09HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham
2012-02-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
2012-02-21HouseAssigned to Labor Committee
2012-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles W. Krezwick
2012-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2012-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon
2012-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2012-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
2012-01-12HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2012-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2012-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
820405611Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback