IL HB3973 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Allows a private special education facility in this State that is a nonprofit entity and that provides special education services only to students who are referred to it by a public school district in this State to require tuition payments by a school district monthly prior to the provision of special education services in accordance with a student's individualized education program for the period that the student is enrolled in the facility pursuant to a placement contract between the facility and the student's school district. Provides that, at or before the end of each regular school term and each summer school term, the private special education facility shall refund to a school district any tuition funds collected by the facility for days that a student was not enrolled in the facility, and if, for any reason, the facility does not satisfy the requirements of the Article or any rules adopted by the State Board of Education regulating private special education facilities, then the State Board, at the request of the school district, may determine that the facility shall refund any tuition funds collected by the facility for days that it was determined by the State Board that the facility was in noncompliance with special education rules. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SPECIAL ED-PRIVATE FAC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-12-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-12-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-12-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-11-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-11-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-11-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105514-7.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback