IL HB3972 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits unlawful use of an animal (currently, this provision only covers elephants) in a traveling animal act when he or she knowingly allows for the participation of an animal in a traveling animal act. Unlawful use of an animal in a traveling animal act is a Class A misdemeanor. Defines "animal". Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
CRIM CD-TRAVELING ANIMALS
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 48-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3972&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3972.htm |