IL HB3971 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Re-assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |