IL HB3969 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the State Police Merit Board for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2017, as follows: Other State Funds $5,132,900.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$FY18 ST POLICE MERIT BD OCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-17HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback