IL HB3966 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Innovation and Technology Act. Modifies provisions concerning the powers and duties of the Department of Innovation and Technology and its Secretary. Provides purpose provisions. Modifies definitions. Makes conforming and other changes in the Department of Innovation and Technology Act and the State Finance Act.
Title
DEPT OF INNOVATION AND TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1370 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-30 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-50 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-55 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-60 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6p-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 8.16a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3966&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3966.htm |