IL HB3936 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation must issue or deny a license no later than 30 days after completion of the application for practical nurse and registered professional nurse licensure. Provides that the Department must issue or deny a license no later than 30 days after receiving the required documentation for advanced practice registered nurse licensure. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSE LICENSURE DEADLINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-02-05 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-12-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-10-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 10-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 55-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 55-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 60-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 60-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3936&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3936.htm |