IL HB3935 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In provisions requiring parental notification of law enforcement detainment and questioning of a student on school grounds, specifies that notification and other actions must be made by a law enforcement officer, a school resource officer, or other school security personnel even if the detainment and questioning is made by another person in the presence of the law enforcement officer, school resource officer, or other school security personnel. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-DETAIN/QUESTION STUDENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |