IL HB3931 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Illinois State Police may develop a system under which the holder of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card may display an electronic version of his or her Firearm Owner's Identification Card on a mobile telephone or other portable electronic device. Provides that an electronic version of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card shall contain security features the Illinois State Police determines to be necessary to ensure that the electronic version is accurate and current and shall satisfy other requirements the Illinois State Police determines to be necessary regarding form and content. Provides that the display or possession of an electronic version of a valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card in accordance with the requirements of the Illinois State Police must satisfy all requirements for the display or possession of a valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card under the laws of the State.
Title
ELECTRONIC FOID CARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 6.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3931&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3931.htm |