IL HB3931 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Requires park districts to determine if an applicant for employment has been convicted of (rather than convicted of or adjudicated a delinquent minor for) specified criminal or drug offenses listed in the Section within 5 years of the application for employment, or convicted of a felony within 2 years (rather than 7 years) of the application for employment. Removes several offenses from the specified criminal or drug offenses listed in the Section. Amends the Chicago Park District Act making the same changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PARK DIST-CRIM BACKGRND CHECK
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Christian Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 8-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1505 | 16a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3931&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3931.htm |