IL HB3930 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities, provides that an otherwise qualified residence that is located upon 2 adjacent parcels in 2 different townships is entitled to the exemption. Provides that a portion of the maximum exemption amount shall be applied to each parcel according to each parcel's share of the total assessed value of the property. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-VETERANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-09-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3930&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3930.htm |