IL HB3929 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the issuance of health care worker decals by the Department of Public Health. Provides that $10 of each original issuance and $23 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Illinois Health Care Workers Benefit Fund, and that $15 of each original issuance and $2 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that money in the Illinois Health Care Workers Benefit Fund shall be paid as grants to the Trinity Health Foundation for the benefit of health care workers, doctors, nurses, and others who work in the health care industry in this State. Makes a corresponding change in the State Finance Act.
Title
VEH CD-HEALTHCARE WORKER DECAL
Sponsors
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] |
Rep. Lance Yednock [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0515 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 019-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 098-000-001 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |