IL HB3928 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced, with the following changes: Creates the Illinois Thirty-by-Thirty Conservation Task Force Act, rather than creating the Illinois Thirty-by-Thirty Conservation Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall hold listening sessions regarding ways in which Illinois can protect 30% of its land and water resources by 2030. Provides that the Task Force shall hold a minimum of three separate listening sessions in geographically distinct areas of the State. Makes other changes. Provides legislative findings. Provides for a repeal of the Illinois Thirty-by-Thirty Conservation Task Force Act and the dissolution of the Task Force on July 1, 2023. Effective immediately.
Title
CONSERVATION TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0618 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2021-06-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |