IL HB3922 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates the Municipal Task Force on Recycling Strategies to Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions to review the status of municipal policies and programs that reduce greenhouse gas emissions nationally and internationally. Provides that the review shall include, but not be limited to, specified greenhouse gas initiatives. Provides that the Task Force shall prepare a report that summarizes its work and makes recommendations resulting from its review. Provides that the Task Force shall submit the report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly no later than one year after the effective date. Contains provisions concerning the membership of the Task Force. Provides that the members of the Task Force shall be appointed no later than 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the provisions creating and concerning the Task Force shall be repealed 2 years after the effective date.
Title
MUNI-GREENHOUSE GAS TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2017-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-002-000 |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Government Transparency Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Government Transparency Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-13 | House | Assigned to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |