IL HB3920 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person who drives or is in actual physical control of a motor vehicle on any highway of this State when his or her driver's license, permit, or privilege to drive is revoked or suspended due to an unpaid civil penalty shall be guilty of a petty offense (rather than a Class A misdemeanor). Provides that a local law enforcement officer shall issue the person a $50 citation for the violation.
Title
VEH CD-UNPAID CIVIL PENALTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1004 |
2018-08-21 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-015-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 073-022-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-07 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-02-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-02-13 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-004-000 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-09 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-003-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |