IL HB3920 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person who drives or is in actual physical control of a motor vehicle on any highway of this State when his or her driver's license, permit, or privilege to drive is revoked or suspended due to an unpaid civil penalty shall be guilty of a petty offense (rather than a Class A misdemeanor). Provides that a local law enforcement officer shall issue the person a $50 citation for the violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-UNPAID CIVIL PENALTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1004
2018-08-21HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-21HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-015-000
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 073-022-000
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-02-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-02-13HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-004-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-003-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62556-303Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback