IL HB3920 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person who drives or is in actual physical control of a motor vehicle on any highway of this State when his or her driver's license, permit, or privilege to drive is revoked or suspended due to an unpaid civil penalty shall be guilty of a petty offense (rather than a Class A misdemeanor). Provides that a local law enforcement officer shall issue the person a $50 citation for the violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-UNPAID CIVIL PENALTY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-004-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-003-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62556-303Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback