IL HB3919 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that each retirement system under the General Assembly, State Employees, State Universities, Downstate Teachers, and Judges Article shall prepare and implement a Tier 3 plan that aggregates employee and State contributions in individual participant accounts that, after meeting any other requirements, are used for payouts after retirement in accordance with any applicable laws. Provides that beginning January 1, 2021, members or participants of those retirement systems, regardless of whether they became members or participants before January 1, 2021, shall participate in the Tier 3 plan in lieu of any other plan under those Articles. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TIER 3 PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3919&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3919.htm |