IL HB3917 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides for the giving of notice and information concerning rates, charges, terms, and conditions of service to customers of telecommunications carriers. Extends the repeal of the Telecommunications Article to July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITIES-TELECOMM RATE INFO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-07HouseTo Special Matters Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220513-1200Amended CodeCitation Text
220513-503Amended CodeCitation Text
220513-505Amended CodeCitation Text
220513-505.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback