IL HB3916 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change: replaces "Circuit Judge" with "judge".
Title
MUNI CD-ADMIN HEARING OFFICER
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass as Amended Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-02-11 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 1-2.1-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |