IL HB3914 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that in addition to suspension of driving privileges, a person convicted of failing to stop his or her vehicle before meeting or overtaking a school bus stopped on a highway, roadway, private road, parking lot, school property, or at any other location shall be subject to a mandatory fine of $300 (rather $150) for a first violation and $1,000 (rather than $500) for a second or subsequent violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-PASSING SCHOOL BUS-FINE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-009-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1414Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback