IL HB3913 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that it is unlawful for a child sex offender with the duty to register to knowingly reside within 250 feet (rather than 500 feet) of a school building, playground, the real property comprising any school that persons under the age of 18 attend, or other specified child care facilities. Provides further requirements concerning a child sex offender's address of registration. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Removes the weekly reporting requirement for persons who lack a fixed residence (currently, both weekly and quarterly or annual reporting are required). Provides that if a person lacks a fixed residence, he or she shall not have to provide documentation of registering address. Makes conforming changes.
Title
SEX OFFENDER RESIDENCY REQ
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-9.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 154 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3913&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3913.htm |