IL HB3910 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that emergency medical services personnel may administer Schedule II, III, IV, or V controlled substances to a person in the scope of their employment without a written, electronic, or oral prescription of a prescriber. Defines emergency medical services personnel. Includes "emergency medical services personnel" in the definition of "practitioner" under the Act.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-EMS PERSONNEL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0280 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 17, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Police & First Responders Committee; 015-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Police & First Responders Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |