IL HB3906 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the CBD Safety Act. Prohibits the sale or distribution of a CBD product unless the CBD product has labeling and has undergone lab testing that meet labeling and minimum testing requirements pursuant to rules adopted by the Department of Agriculture. Requires the Department to administer and enforce the Act and to develop rules for the labeling and minimum testing requirements of CBD products using a specified provision of the Illinois Administrative Code as a model. Provides that the Department of Public Health, the Illinois State Police, and the Department of Agriculture may inspect any business that manufactures, processes, transports, or distributes CBD products in the State to ensure compliance with the Act. Provides specified criminal fines, imprisonment, and administrative penalties for violations of the Act and directs that criminal fines collected under the Act shall be deposited into the CBD Safety Fund. Allows the Director to pursue and a court to grant a temporary restraining order or a preliminary or permanent injunction restraining any person from violating the Act. Contains other provisions. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Allows the Department of Agriculture to adopt emergency rules to implement the CBD Safety Act. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the CBD Safety Fund. Effective 180 days after becoming law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CBD SAFETY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-10-17HouseFirst Reading
2019-10-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-10-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-10-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-10-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback