IL HB3905 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Crime Reduction Act of 2009. Adds definition of "offender" and deletes definition of "violent offender". Provides that all offenders (rather than just non-violent offenders) are eligible for the Adult Redeploy Illinois program.
Title
ADULT REDEPLOY-ELIGIBILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-003-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-07 | House | Re-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 190 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 190 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |