IL HB3904 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-11)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall establish a Women's Correctional Services Division under the authority of a Chief of Women's Correctional Services, which must be a Senior Public Service Administrator level position. Provides that the Chief of Women's Correctional Services shall be appointed by the Director of Corrections. Provides that the Chief of Women's Correctional Services shall have the same authority as the Chief of Operations that oversees all male prison facility operations. Provides that the Women's Correctional Services Division shall: (1) be accountable for management and oversight of the operations of all State women's correctional facilities; (2) be accountable for all Department of Corrections employees working with women under the custody of the Department in State women's correctional facilities; and (3) be accountable for all employees working in the Department of Corrections Parole Division that supervise women on mandatory supervised release and any contractors providing services to women in the custody of the Department or under the supervision of the Department in any capacity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-WOMENS CORRECTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-04HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-03-15HouseIn line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e).
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-07HouseRe-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-2-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback